Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Safeco Insurance Company Of America, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by O'Connor Edward Richard Esq., against Anderson Brice, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Kristin S. Escalante presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKristin S. Escalante Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 24, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss; Filed by: Safeco Insurance Company of America (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Safeco Insurance Company of America (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Safeco Insurance Company of America (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Safeco Insurance Company of America (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Brice Piller Erroneously Sued As Brice Anderson (Respondent)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Safeco Insurance Company of America (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Brice Anderson (Respondent)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel (for Respondent and Claimant Brice Anderson)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Notice (of Errata)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Notice (of Paying Filing Fees for Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Setting of Hearing Date Re: 1. Petitioner, Safe...))
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Petition (Petition of Safeco Insurance Company of America to Open Uninsured Motorist Discovery Case)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Respondent Br...))
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel (for Respondent and Claimant Brice Anderson)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.