Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Taylor Marc A., filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Brown Robert, Vakili Sa'Id, against City Of West Covina, represented by Oconnell Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel S. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel S. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Separate Statement; Filed by: City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Order re Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment or Adjudication; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-14T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-23T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-24T00:00:00Notice Notice of Errata re: MPA in Opposition to CWC's MIL No. 5; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-24T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff); City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by:
Date: 2023-08-24T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff); As to: City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: City of West Covina (Defendant); As to: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Order re Defendant City of West Covina's Demurrer to First Amended Complaint; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees MARC A. TAYLOR; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions; Filed by: City of West Covina (Defendant); As to: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff); As to: City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff); As to: City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Order re Plaintiff's Motions to Compel Further Depositions; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by:
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Order re Defendant's Motion for Sanctions; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Jury Instructions JOINT; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Reply IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; Filed by: City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Updated -- Motion for Sanctions: Filed By: City of West Covina (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date:
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Answer Filed by City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Jury Instructions (JOINT) Filed by Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Answers at Depos...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions Filed by City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Order (re Defendant City of West Covina's Demurrer to First Amended Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (MARC A. TAYLOR) Filed by Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue the Hearing Date ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIA...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Order (re Plaintiff's Motions to Compel Further Depositions) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Order (re Defendant's Motion for Sanctions) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Order (re Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment or Adjudication) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Marc A. Taylor (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS) Filed by City of West Covina (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Extend Deadline to File Responsive Pleading and Continue Case Management)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue the Hearing Date ...))
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Declaration (OF THOMAS M. O'CONNELL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY OF WEST COVINA'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Declaration (Of Demurring Or moving Party in Support Of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIA...))
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (MARC A. TAYLOR)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Declaration (OF DAVID CARMANY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY OF WEST COVINA'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Order (re Defendant City of West Covina's Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer to Plaintiff Marc A. Taylor's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Extend Deadline to File Responsive Pleading and Continue Case Management)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (MARC A. TAYLOR)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Declaration (Of Demurring Or moving Party in Support Of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer to Plaintiff Marc A. Taylor's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.