Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rosales Amado, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Elihu Kaveh Sam, Moorhead Samuel Joseph, against Ahmadian Ali, Conners Jim, Rockn Pies Pizza Co Llc An Unknown Business Entity, represented by Deutsch Shirley D., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Bruce G. Iwasaki presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBruce G. Iwasaki Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management139 days |
Filing DateMay 28, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions88 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Amado Rosales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Amado Rosales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Trial Readiness Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Kaveh Sam Elihu (Attorney)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Amado Rosales (Plaintiff)
Date: January 13, 2023Request for Dismissal Filed by Amado Rosales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; Post-MSC Status Conference))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Amado Rosales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Readiness Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Amado Rosales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; MSC Conference Conference; OS...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Amado Rosales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Amado Rosales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Amado Rosales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Status Conference (Post-MSC Re Resol...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; MSC Conference Conference; OS...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Amado Rosales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose); Order to Show Cause Re: Dism...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; Post-Mediation Status Confere...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Trial Readiness Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Kaveh Sam Elihu (Attorney)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Amado Rosales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Amado Rosales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Demurrer to Answer)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; Post-MSC Status Conference)))
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; MSC Conference Conference; OS...))
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose); Order to Show Cause Re: Dism...))
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; MSC Conference Conference; OS...))
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; Post-Mediation Status Confere...))
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; MSC Conference Conference; OS...))
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose); Order to Show Cause Re: Dism...))
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; MSC Conference Conference; OS...))
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Demurrer to Answer)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/02/2021)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; Post-MSC Status Conference)))
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Amado Rosales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.