Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
7-Eleven Inc., Amco Insurance Company On Behalf Of Estate Of Yong Ho Joe Deceased Pursuant To Probate Code Section 553 Named In Stip Filed 4 5 21, Joe Hyun, Yong Ho Joe Dba 7-Eleven, Griffin Jr. David Lee, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Manapol Michael P., Witzer Brian David, against 7-Eleven Inc., Estate Of Yong Ho Joe Deceased Pursuant To Probate Code Sec 550 Et Seq. Named In Stip Filed 4 5 21, Joe Hyun, Joe Yong Ho, L.A. Sunset 7600 Inc., (total of 9) See All represented by Etmekjian Garbis N., Hart Jr. James P., Hart James Paul Jr, Shapiro David B., Shapiro David Brian, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaura A. Seigle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 15, 2020 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Isabel Antonio Portillo (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Isabel Antonio Portillo (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: David Lee Griffin Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Cross-Complaint; Filed by: 7-Eleven, Inc. (Defendant); As to: World Private Security, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Setting a Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: David Lee Griffin Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: 7-Eleven, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: 7-Eleven, Inc. (Defendant); As to: David Lee Griffin Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: 7-Eleven, Inc. (Defendant); Hyun Joe (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: 7-Eleven, Inc. (Defendant); Hyun Joe (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Default entered as to World Private Security, Inc. On the Complaint filed by David Lee Griffin Jr. on
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Isabel Antonio Portillo (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by: 7-Eleven, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Isabel Antonio Portillo (Defendant); As to: David Lee Griffin Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: David Lee Griffin Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: David Lee Griffin Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: David Lee Griffin Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Default entered as to Farid Youssif; On the Amended Complaint (2nd) filed by David Lee Griffin Jr. on
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: David Lee Griffin Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Isabel Antonio Portillo (Cross-Defendant); As to: Hyun Joe (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal "NOT ENTERED"; Filed by: Hyun Joe (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Isabel Antonio Portillo (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJUR...))
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (IN YONG JO JOE dba 7-ELEVEN AND HYUN JOE MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Setting a Case Management Conference) of 12/03/2020)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Setting a Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion to Strike Hearing Off Calendar)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurr...))
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Reply (to Omnibus Opposition to Motions to Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Substituting Names of Defendants)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Substitut...))
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order on Stipulation)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Notice (of Setting Trial Date, Final Status Conference, and Pre-Trial Deadlines)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service on W...))
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of OSC re Service of Cross Complaints and Setting of OSC re Entry of Default)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Taking Non-Appearance Case Review Off-Calendar))
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service on W...))
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 32 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
May 12, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 48 Jury Trial ((10 day estimate)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Jury Trial ((10 day estimate)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 48 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
November 08, 2022 | Hearing | Status Conference re Mediation scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 48 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | On the Amended Cross-Complaint (1st) filed by 7-Eleven, Inc. on , entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice as to the entire action | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 48 Status Conference (re Mediation) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Status Conference (re Mediation) - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 48 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY ON BEHALF OF ESTATE OF YONG HO JOE, DECEASED, PURSUANT TO PROBATE CODE SECTION 553 (Named in stip filed ) (Cross-Complainant); 7-Eleven, Inc. (Defendant); Hyun Joe (Defendant); ESTATE OF YONG HO JOE, DECEASED, PURSUANT TO PROBATE CODE SEC 550 ET SEQ. (Named in stip filed ) (Defendant) | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Retaining New Legal Representation on...) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.