Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Walker Jessica, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Mayor Eric Garcetti, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with William F. Fahey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam F. Fahey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2020 |
CategoryFraud (No Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time195 days |
Complaint
Date: February 14, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: February 14, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: February 14, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...))
Date: August 27, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/14/2020)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.