Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Angel Mercado A Minore By Olivia Jaramillo As His Guardian Ad Litem, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Reyes Jual F, Reyes Jual Felix Esq., against Beltran Mario E, Beltran Santos Anabelis, represented by Arakelyan Cristina, Reisinger Robert Lee Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Serena R. Murillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSerena R. Murillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death - Uninsured Motorist (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Guardian ad litem re: Angel; Filed by:
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Mario E Beltran (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Santos Anabelis Beltran (Defendant); Mario E Beltran (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Santos Anabelis Beltran (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Santos Anabelis Beltran (Defendant); Mario E Beltran (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Angel)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (to File First Amended Complaint (CCP Sections 473 and 576 and CRC 3.1324))
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for an Order Shor...))
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Reply (in further support of Motion for Leave To Amend to File First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter Re: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel F...))
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Com...))
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Reply (in further support of Motion to Compel further responses to Request for Production)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiffs' Unopposed Ex-Parte Application to Cont...))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend / File First...))
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Reply (in further support of Motion to Compel further responses to Requests for Admissions)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (To Continue Trial and All Trial Related Dates (unopposed))
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement))
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 12/03/2021)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (To Continue Trial and All Trial Related Dates (Unopposed))
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (to File First Amended Complaint (CCP Sections 473 and 576 and CRC 3.1324))
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Reply (in further support of Motion for Leave To Amend to File First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Angel)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00[Proposed] Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Order to Shorten Time
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (to File First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.