Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Transamerica Life Insurance Company, filed a(n) Other Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Belcher David A., against Resendez Alexandria, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Theresa M. Traber presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTheresa M. Traber Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryOther Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 31, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 31, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: January 05, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 07, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 14, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 29, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: February 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER UNCONTESTED APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF...)
Date: February 19, 2021Order - ORDER APPROVING TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT
Date: March 05, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (n In Support Of Approval Of Transfer)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Uncontested approval of transfer of...))
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Notice (Notice Of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.