Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
County Of Los Angeles, filed a(n) Writ - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Hashmall Jennifer Mira, against County Of Los Angeles, Los Angeles County Employee Relations Commission, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with James C. Chalfant presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames C. Chalfant Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2020 |
CategoryWrit - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Lodging of Administrative Record; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued N.O.A. ; B317439; "X"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal "X"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance N.O.A. ; B317439; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Appellant)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Reply Petitioner County of Los Angeles' Reply Brief; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Decision on petition for writ of mandate: granted in part; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Appeal - Resp Notice Electing Appendix Submitted APP-011; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Mira Hashmall; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Decision on petition for writ of mandate: granted in part]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Brief PETITIONER COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES? OPENING BRIEF; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF VACATING DEFAULT OR NON-COMPLIANCE; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 01, 2022Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Petition (Petition for Writ of Administrative Mandate (C.C.P. ¿ 1094.5))
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER TO PETITION)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Decision on petition for writ of mandate: granted in part])
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Mira Hashmall)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Reply (Petitioner County of Los Angeles' Reply Brief)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Brief (PETITIONER COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES? OPENING BRIEF)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Notice of Lodging of Additional Authority)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Decision on petition for writ of mandate: granted in part
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate))
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Administrative Record)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/07/2021)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.