Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Caro Israel, Fisher Shovaughn, filed a(n) Workplace Harassment - Labor and Employment case represented by Lee David J. Esq., against Caro Israel, Santa Monica Yacht Club Dba Santa Monica Windjammers Yacht Club, Smwyc Fbo Llc, represented by Onyemaobim Obiora Ikedi, Rastegar Diba, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Stephanie M. Bowick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephanie M. Bowick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2020 |
CategoryWorkplace Harassment With Damages (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWorkplace Harassment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Answer; Filed by: Santa Monica Yacht Club, (Defendant); As to: Shovaughn Fisher (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Santa Monica Yacht Club, (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Santa Monica Yacht Club, (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Shovaughn Fisher (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Santa Monica Yacht Club, (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Shovaughn Fisher (Cross-Defendant); As to: Israel Caro (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Santa Monica Yacht Club, (Cross-Defendant); As to: Israel Caro (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Santa Monica Yacht Club, (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Shovaughn Fisher (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Santa Monica Yacht Club, (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Shovaughn Fisher (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Shovaughn Fisher (Petitioner); As to: Santa Monica Yacht Club, (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Shovaughn Fisher (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Israel Caro (Cross-Complainant); As to: Shovaughn Fisher (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Shovaughn Fisher (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Shovaughn Fisher (Petitioner); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Santa Monica Yacht Club, (Defendant); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Santa Monica Yacht Club, (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Plaintiff Shovaughn Fisher's Peremptory Chall...))
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.