Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bvba Pfeyfer A Belgian Corporation, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Ahn Jihee, against Atelier Am Inc. A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Samantha P. Jessner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSamantha P. Jessner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2020 |
CategoryOther Enforcement Of Judgment Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Complaint
Date: September 02, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: September 04, 2020Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: September 11, 2020Request for Dismissal Filed by BVBA PFEYFER, a Belgian corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: October 30, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by BVBA PFEYFER, a Belgian corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Complaint Filed by BVBA PFEYFER, a Belgian corporation (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by BVBA PFEYFER, a Belgian corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment) of 09/04/2020)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment))
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.