Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Mendoza Melissa Yvette Harrell Aka Melissa Yvette Harrell, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine Lu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Petition for Change of Name
Date: August 27, 2020Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: August 27, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 27, 2020Proof of Publication Filed by Melissa Yvette Harrell Mendoza (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Melissa Yvette Harrell Mendoza (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Decree Changing Name Filed by Melissa Yvette Harrell Mendoza (Petitioner)
Date: January 11, 2021Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Decree Changing Name; Signed and Filed by: Melissa Yvette Harrell Mendoza (Petitioner)
Date: January 11, 2021Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 11, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Melissa Yvette Harrell Mendoza (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by Melissa Yvette Harrell Mendoza (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)) Filed by Clerk
Date: January 11, 2021Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name; Filed by: Melissa Yvette Harrell Mendoza (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Publication; Filed by: Melissa Yvette Harrell Mendoza (Petitioner); Service Costs Waived: No
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name Filed by Melissa Yvette Harrell Mendoza (Petitioner) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change))
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of 12/16/2020)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.