Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Flores Jaime, filed a(n) Other Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Monteclaro Jaime G., against County Of Los Angeles Sheriff Department, Villanueva Alex, represented by Ivie Rickey, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Teresa A. Beaudet presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTeresa A. Beaudet Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management128 days |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2020 |
CategoryOther Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Declaration Jaime G. Monteclaro; Filed by: JAIME FLORES (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Declaration (Jaime G. Monteclaro)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: wny sanctions of $250.00 should not b...))
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY RE: REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 12/02/2020)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.