Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center Of Los Angeles Et Al., filed a(n) Other Writ /Judicial Review (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Stock Stanton James, against Bradley P. Gilbert Director California Department Of Health Care Services, California Department Of Health Care Services, represented by Wang Kenneth, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with James C. Chalfant presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames C. Chalfant Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 17, 2020 |
CategoryOther Writ /Judicial Review (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Decision on motion to compel further discovery responses: denied; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 21, 2022Decision on petition for writ of mandate: denied; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL. (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Declaration - DECLARATION OF STANTON STOCK
Date: April 30, 2021Petition - PETITION AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: April 30, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: October 07, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF KRISTINA NACINO IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION BRIEF
Date: October 07, 2021Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: November 03, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: November 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF RESPONDENT FOR AN ORDER TO...)
Date: November 04, 2021Reply - REPLY PETITIONERS' AMENDED REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MADATE
Date: January 04, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: February 03, 2022Order - DECISION ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE: DENIED
Date: March 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: March 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT)
Date: April 25, 2022Judgment
Date: April 25, 2022Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: June 24, 2022Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: June 30, 2022Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: July 05, 2022Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript
Date: September 21, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Summons (on Petition) Filed by WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Decision on motion to compel further discovery responses: denied Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order - Stipulation and Order to Continue)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion of Petitioner to Compel Production of Docum...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order - Continuance of Hearing on Motion to Compel Prod...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Decision on petition for writ of mandate: denied Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Notice of Entry of Judgment and Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered Filed by Clerk
Date: November 23, 2022Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Respondent for an Order to...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript Filed by Clerk
Date: September 21, 2022Notice of Continuance Filed by WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL. (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Declaration (OF STANTON J. STOCK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel (PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order - Stipulation and Order to Continue))
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order - Continuance of Hearing on Motion to Compel Prod...))
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Decision on motion to compel further discovery responses: denied
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Reply (PETITIONERS? REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion of Petitioner to Compel Production of Docum...))
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF MICHAEL LESNICK IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS OPENING BRIEF)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Petition (Amended verified petition for writ of mandate)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Reply (Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Reply (TO RESPONDENTS' OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Kristina Nacino in Support of Respondent's Opposition Brief)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Opposition (PETITIONERS' OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS EX PARTE APPLICATION)
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Stanton Stock)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Answer (TO THE AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Order (Stipulation to Continue the Hearing on the Petition for Writ of Mandate and Associated Deadlines)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Brief (PETITIONERS OPENING BRIEF)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Petitioners' Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (OF JOINT APPENDIX, TRIAL NOTEBOOK AND ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Declaration (Amended Decl of Kristina Nacino in Support of Respondents' Opposition Brief)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Brief (CORRECTED PETITIONERS OPENING BRIEF)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate))
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Opposition (PETITIONERS OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS MOTION TO STRIKE/OBJECTIONS)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Reply (PETITIONERS' AMENDED REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MADATE)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF STANTON STOCK RE CORRECTED OPENING BRIEF)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Respondent for an Order to...))
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 17, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 17, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION
Date: April 21, 2020Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: April 21, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 27, 2020Answer
Date: September 16, 2020Separate Statement
Date: November 19, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE)
Date: January 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PROD...)
Date: February 22, 2021Order - DECISION ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES: DENIED
Date: April 15, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: April 20, 2021Brief - BRIEF PETITIONERS OPENING BRIEF
Date: July 16, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 16, 2021Reply - REPLY TO RESPONDENTS' OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: October 25, 2021Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: October 25, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION PETITIONERS' OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: November 03, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 30, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF STANTON STOCK RE CORRECTED OPENING BRIEF
Date: December 16, 2021Brief - BRIEF CORRECTED PETITIONERS OPENING BRIEF
Date: December 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: March 22, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.