Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jaj1 Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Jaj2 Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Jaj3 Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Jaj4 Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Jaj5 Llc A Califorrnia Limited Liability Company, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against American Arbitration Association An Association, Bp1 Llc A Limited Liability Company, Bp2 Llc A Limited Liability Company, Bp3 Llc A Limited Liability Company, Bp5 Llc A Limited Liability Company, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Mark H. Epstein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark H. Epstein Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 02, 2020 |
CategoryOther Commercial Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 08, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 02, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 02, 2020Complaint
Date: November 02, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 05, 2020Notice of Related Case
Date: November 05, 2020Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Date: November 12, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 12, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT H. BISNO IN SUPPORT OF TRO
Date: November 12, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO)
Date: November 13, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 13, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED IN SCV-266510
Date: November 16, 2020Reply - REPLY TO BP PARTIES OPP TP OSC RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND POS
Date: December 03, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION ISO PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO BP PARTIES OPP RE OSC PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: December 03, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: December 03, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 10, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO NON PARTIES RJN AND COMMENTARY
Date: December 10, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: December 15, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF RULING
Date: December 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: January 08, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 01/08/2021
Date: January 08, 2021Order - ORDER (PROPOSED) OF DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION
Date: January 12, 2021Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling) Filed by American Arbitration Association, an association (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for TRO)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Notice of Related case Filed in SCV-266510)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Plaintiffs Reply to BP Parties OPP RE OSC Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Reply (to BP Parties OPP tp OSC RE Preliminary Injunction and POS)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Temporary Restraining Order)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for TRO))
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration In Response To Non Parties RJN and Commentary)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert H. Bisno in Support of TRO)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.