Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Fc Marketplace Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Chow Ron, against Avicenna Medical Group A Medical Corporation A California Corporation, Chimeh Ind. And As Guarantor Seyed, represented by Adli Dariush G., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Mark H. Epstein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark H. Epstein Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 19, 2020 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.