Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Weather Vane Productions Inc., Weather Vane Productions Inc. Nv, Weather Van Productions Inc. Wy, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Halimi Daniel, against Kanter Cathryn Conroy, Trafficked Llc, represented by Johnson Neville L, Marashlian Aleeza L., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Mark H. Epstein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark H. Epstein Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 16, 2020 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: WEATHER VANE PRODUCTIONS, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Trafficked, LLC (Defendant); Cathryn Conroy Kanter (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Trafficked, LLC (Defendant); Cathryn Conroy Kanter (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Motion for Order Reimbursement Costs for Service; Filed by: WEATHER VANE PRODUCTIONS, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Trafficked, LLC (Defendant); Cathryn Conroy Kanter (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 17, 2023Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Trafficked, LLC (Defendant); Cathryn Conroy Kanter (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: TRAFFICKED, LLC (Defendant); CATHRYN CONROY KANTER (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Weather Van Productions, Inc. (WY) (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Order for Publication Filed by Weather Van Productions, Inc. (WY) (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Weather Van Productions, Inc. (WY) (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Trafficked, LLC (Defendant); Cathryn Conroy Kanter (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Weather Van Productions, Inc. (WY) (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by Weather Van Productions, Inc. (WY) (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Trafficked, LLC (Defendant); Cathryn Conroy Kanter (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Application (for Publication of Summons) Filed by Weather Van Productions, Inc. (WY) (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Weather Van Productions, Inc. (WY) (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Answer Filed by Trafficked, LLC (Defendant); Cathryn Conroy Kanter (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Trafficked, LLC (Defendant); Cathryn Conroy Kanter (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Trafficked, LLC (Defendant); Cathryn Conroy Kanter (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Order) Filed by Trafficked, LLC (Defendant); Cathryn Conroy Kanter (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Order to Show...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Trafficked, LLC (Defendant); Cathryn Conroy Kanter (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Order for Publication
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Daniel I. Halimi in Support of Application for Publication of Summons)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Demurrers to The First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Motion for Order (Reimbursement Costs for Service)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Application (for Publication of Summons)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of )
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal))
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Withdrawal re: Motion for Costs)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Order to Show...) of )
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Daniel I. Halimi RE: Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Notice (of Errata RE: First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Demurrers to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration RE: Order to Show Cause RE: Entry of Default)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:002nd Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment))
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice (Of Continuance of Order to Show Cause Re: Entry Of Default Judgment)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Order to Show...))
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment) of )
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Daniel I. Halimi ISO Motion for Order (Reimbursement Costs for Service))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Daniel I. Halimi in Support of Application for Publication of Summons)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/23/2020)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Application (for Publication of Summons)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice (of Errata RE: First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment))
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Daniel I. Halimi ISO Motion for Order (Reimbursement Costs for Service))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Demurrers to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Demurrers to The First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment) of 05/20/2021)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Withdrawal re: Motion for Costs)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Notice (Of Continuance of Order to Show Cause Re: Entry Of Default Judgment)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Motion for Order (Reimbursement Costs for Service)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration RE: Order to Show Cause RE: Entry of Default)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 09/24/2021)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Order to Show...))
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Daniel I. Halimi RE: Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Application (for Publication of Summons)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Daniel I. Halimi in Support of Application for Publication of Summons)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Order for Publication
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.