Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Blaha Construction And Development, Canoga Sheet Metal Products Inc., Current Electric Contracting & Design Inc., E.R.R.A Brothers Dba Stone Crafters, Northstar Cabinet Construction Inc., (total of 7) See All filed a(n) Construction - Torts case represented by Garcia Israel, against Abm Heating & A C Inc., A W Holyak, Bedford Neal Mcgruder, Benchmark Builders Showroom Inc., Bermuda Import-Export Inc., (total of 29) See All represented by Asuncion Catherine, Dunn Brian, Ebner Darren, Eum David, Guzman Alexa, (total of 14) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Mark H. Epstein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark H. Epstein Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 05, 2020 |
CategoryConstruction Defect (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeConstruction |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Fashion Blinds Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by Mashatu, LLC on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Conditional Settlement as to SCMS Construction, Inc. Filed by: Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: E.R.R.A Brothers (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Northstar Cabinet Construction Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Current Electric Contracting & Design, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Northstar Cabinet Construction Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JS Glass & Mirror Corporation, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Current Electric Contracting & Design, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: M & M Plastering, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: J.M.I. Steel, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: JS Glass & Mirror Corporation, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Default entered as to Custom Cabs, Inc. On the Complaint filed by Mashatu, LLC on
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Leija Designs, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JS Glass & Mirror Corporation, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Stipulation to Set Aside Default:) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Blaha Construction and Development (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Canoga Sheet Metal Products, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Thome Waterproofing Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Fashion Blinds Inc. (Defendant); As to: Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: SCMS Construction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Current Electric Contracting & Design, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Northstar Cabinet Construction Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: E.R.R.A Brothers (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Wallace and Associates Incorporated (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Leija Designs, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Wallace and Associates Incorporated (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Default entered as to Bermuda Import-Export, Inc. On the Complaint filed by Mashatu, LLC on
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Wallace and Associates Incorporated (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Current Electric Contracting & Design, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Northstar Cabinet Construction Inc. (Defendant); As to: Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: J Santillana Contractors (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Canoga Sheet Metal Products, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: M & M Plastering, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Declaration of Mark. A. Arreguin in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: SCMS Construction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: MSS Construction (Defendant); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: E.R.R.A Brothers (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Blaha Construction and Development (Defendant); As to: Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Fashion Blinds Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Thome Waterproofing Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Current Electric Contracting & Design, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Fashion Blinds Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Thome Waterproofing Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Canoga Sheet Metal Products, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Thome Waterproofing Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: JS Glass & Mirror Corporation, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Current Electric Contracting & Design, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Blaha Construction and Development (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Blaha Construction and Development (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Default entered as to MSS Construction; On the Complaint filed by Mashatu, LLC on
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: E.R.R.A Brothers (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Blaha Construction and Development (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: Blaha Construction and Development (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Blaha Construction and Development (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Cross-Complaint; Filed by: E.R.R.A Brothers (Defendant); As to: ROES 1-100 (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: E.R.R.A Brothers (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Northstar Cabinet Construction Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Wallace and Associates Incorporated (Defendant); As to: Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Northstar Cabinet Construction Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: MSS Construction (Defendant); As to: Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: Thome Waterproofing Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Northstar Cabinet Construction Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: JS Glass & Mirror Corporation, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Canoga Sheet Metal Products, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: SCMS Construction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Current Electric Contracting & Design, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Thome Waterproofing Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JS Glass & Mirror Corporation, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Default entered as to Benchmark Builders Showroom, Inc. On the Complaint filed by Mashatu, LLC on
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00[PROPOSED] ORDER; Signed and Filed by: Canoga Sheet Metal Products, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notices of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: SCMS Construction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Canoga Sheet Metal Products, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 05, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 05, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 05, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 05, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM
Date: October 05, 2020Answer
Date: November 12, 2020Answer
Date: November 17, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: November 17, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 17, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: November 17, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 17, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 07, 2020Answer
Date: December 07, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: December 11, 2020Answer
Date: December 15, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: December 28, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: December 28, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 08, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 09, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 10, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 12, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 17, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 22, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 01, 2021Answer
Date: April 22, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 22, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 22, 2021Cross-Complaint
Date: April 22, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: April 26, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: May 10, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 10, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY
Date: May 18, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: May 11, 2021Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING INTERVENTION
Date: May 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: May 25, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: June 07, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 21, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 24, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 09, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: July 13, 2021Order - ORDER PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: July 14, 2021Cross-Complaint
Date: August 09, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 10, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 01, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 02, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: February 09, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 17, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: May 09, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 17, 2022Answer
Date: May 20, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT AS TO E.R.R.A. BROTHERS DBA STONE CRAFTERS
Date: November 02, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT AS TO SCMS CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Date: November 16, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: November 16, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT)
Date: November 16, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: November 22, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT AS TO CURRENT ELECTRIC CONTRACTING & DESIGN, INC.
Date: November 22, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: November 30, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED 12/...)
Date: December 22, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: December 28, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: January 03, 2023Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: January 06, 2023Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: January 11, 2023Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: January 13, 2023Notice of Motion
Date: January 31, 2023Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: February 02, 2023Notice of Settlement
Date: February 02, 2023Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER
Date: February 06, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: February 07, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ...)
Date: February 06, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ...)
Date: February 07, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: COMPLIANCE WITH SETTLEMENT; ORDER TO ...)
Date: February 14, 2023Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER
Date: February 15, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ...)
Date: February 15, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: February 16, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: February 23, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 06, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: March 09, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: April 04, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: April 26, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION OF CATHERINE M. ASUNCION IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER
Date: December 28, 2020Answer
Date: February 02, 2021Application - APPLICATION FOR ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE OF PROCESS ON SECRETARY OF STATE
Date: February 16, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: February 17, 2021Association of Attorney
Date: February 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE ...)
Date: February 18, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 24, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: February 25, 2021Answer
Date: February 26, 2021Cross-Complaint - CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY CONTRIBUTION AND DECLARATORY RELIEF
Date: February 26, 2021Cross-Complaint
Date: February 26, 2021Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT
Date: March 01, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 08, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: March 09, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 20, 2022Answer
Date: April 20, 2022Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: April 20, 2022Notice (OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY) Filed by Blaha Construction and Development (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by JS Glass & Mirror Corporation, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Northstar Cabinet Construction Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Answer Filed by Northstar Cabinet Construction Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Thome Waterproofing Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Mark. A. Arreguin in Support of Ex Parte Application) Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by JS Glass & Mirror Corporation, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet (Addendum) Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: J Santillana Contractors (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by Canoga Sheet Metal Products, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by Fashion Blinds Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by E.R.R.A Brothers (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Current Electric Contracting & Design, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Northstar Cabinet Construction Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Current Electric Contracting & Design, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by Blaha Construction and Development (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Complaint (for Damages) Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Answer Filed by JS Glass & Mirror Corporation, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Fashion Blinds Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by J.M.I. Steel, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Fashion Blinds Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Wallace and Associates Incorporated (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Northstar Cabinet Construction Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Northstar Cabinet Construction Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Northstar Cabinet Construction Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Canoga Sheet Metal Products, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Northstar Cabinet Construction Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Current Electric Contracting & Design, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Filed by Thome Waterproofing Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Blaha Construction and Development (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Filed by Blaha Construction and Development (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Blaha Construction and Development (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice (of Conditional Settlement as to M&M Plastering, Inc.) Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT) Filed by MSS Construction (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Wallace and Associates Incorporated (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement Filed by MSS Construction (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by J Santillana Contractors (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Joint Stipulation and Order Regarding Intervention Filed by SCMS Construction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Blaha Construction and Development (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Current Electric Contracting & Design, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Northstar Cabinet Construction Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Wallace and Associates Incorporated (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Current Electric Contracting & Design, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by E.R.R.A Brothers (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Wallace and Associates Incorporated (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Thome Waterproofing Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention Filed by SCMS Construction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Permitting Service ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Blaha Construction and Development (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Fashion Blinds Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by Thome Waterproofing Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by Leija Designs, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Blaha Construction and Development (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Current Electric Contracting & Design, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by Current Electric Contracting & Design, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Leija Designs, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by E.R.R.A Brothers (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by JS Glass & Mirror Corporation, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Thome Waterproofing Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by JS Glass & Mirror Corporation, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by E.R.R.A Brothers (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by SCMS Construction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Blaha Construction and Development (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Blaha Construction and Development (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Answer Filed by Wallace and Associates Incorporated (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Canoga Sheet Metal Products, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Thome Waterproofing Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Answer Filed by J Santillana Contractors (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Notice (of Change of Handling Attorney) Filed by Blaha Construction and Development (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Global Settlement and...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Notice (of Conditional Settlement as to SCMS Construction, Inc.) Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6) Filed by E.R.R.A Brothers (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by E.R.R.A Brothers (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Canoga Sheet Metal Products, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by SCMS Construction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by JS Glass & Mirror Corporation, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation to Set Aside Default:)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by MSS Construction (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Conditional Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by SCMS Construction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by M & M Plastering, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Answer Filed by M & M Plastering, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Stipulation to Set Aside Default:) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Settlement filed 12/...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by MSS Construction (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Current Electric Contracting & Design, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notices of Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notices of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Mashatu, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Complaint (for Damages)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet (Addendum)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Order (Directing Service of Process on Secretary of State for Defendant SCMS Construction, Inc.)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Permitting Service ...))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Mark. A. Arreguin in Support of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Catherine M. Asuncion in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order Permitting Service of Process on Secretary of State)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Application (for Order Permitting Service of Process on Secretary of State)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Notice (Consent for Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Notice (OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint (for Indemnity Contribution and Declaratory Relief)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Joint Stipulation and Order Regarding Intervention
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.