Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Pacific 26 Management Llc A California Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Pugh Firouzeh, against The House Of Tarchnas Living Trust With Robert K. Tarquinio Phd Trustee As His Separate Property By Inheritance From Father To Son, Tarquinio Robert K. Phd, Tarquinio Phd Robert E., Pacific 26 Management Llc A California Limited Liability Company, represented by Santos Patrick Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Mark H. Epstein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark H. Epstein Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Post-Foreclosure (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedApril 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER FOR THE IMMEDIAT...))
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S MANDATORY COVER SHEET AND SUPPLEMENTAL ALLEGATIONS?UNLAWFUL DETAINER
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Form Interrogatories - General
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 12/23/2020)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Answer (to Demand for Production and Inspection of Documents and other Tangible Things)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Request (for Admission)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Answer (to Form Interrogatories)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Form Interrogatories - Unlawful Detainer
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (1 Day Estimate)))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Answer (to form Interrogatories)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Answer (to Request for Admissions)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Other - (Demand for Production of Documents)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (1 Day Estimate)))
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Declaration (Exhibits "D and "J" to Declaration of Defendant Robert E. Taquino)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (1 Day Estimate)))
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Brief (Regarding Issue of Title by Defendant Robert Taquinio)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Defendant Robert E. Tarquinio)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Brief (Closing Argument)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Request (FOR ONE COURT DAY LEAVE TO FILE QUIET TITLE ACTION ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT A)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE SIMULTANEOUS RESPONSIVE CLOSING BRIEFS)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's Reply Brief)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Declaration (OF DEFENDANT ROBERT E. TARQUINIO REGARDING NEWLY DISCOVERED REBUTTAL EVIDENCE)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Brief (RESPONSIVE CLOSING ARGUMENT BY DEFENDANT ROBERT TARQUINIO; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Brief (Plaintiff's Closing Brief)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Fay Pugh Re: Amended Statement of Decision)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 03/01/2021)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF FAY PUGH RE: [PROPOSED] STATEMENT OF DECISION AND [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Related Cases Filed on 09/03/2021) of 09/09/2021)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Objection (to Defendants' Statement of Decision)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Statement of Decision))
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiff's Objection and Request to Strike Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Notice (OF FILING OF ADMITTED DEFENSE TRIAL EXHIBITS)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Exhibits) of 05/25/2021)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Oral Argument Re: Bench Trial))
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Re Notice of Related Cases Filed on 09/03/2021) of 09/09/2021)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Exhibits))
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Objection (TO PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION BY RED-LINE TRACK CHANGES)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/29/2021, Proposed Statement of Decision)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application f...))
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Defense Objections to Proposed Statement of Decision
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Statement of Decision (Proposed)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Entry of Statement of Decision and Judgment)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: October 29, 2021Notice (DEFENSE NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE OBJECTION TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT WITHIN 10 DAYS)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Response (by Plaintiff to Defense Objection to Proposed Statement of Decision)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: October 21, 2021Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)
Date: November 04, 2021Judgment
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Opposition (by Plaintiff to Defendants' Ex Parte Application)
Date: November 09, 2021Statement of Decision
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Notice (OF INTENT TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO THE PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION WITHIN 15 DAYS)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Ex Parte Application)
Date: October 25, 2021Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Objections to Statement of Dec...))
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.