Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Javidzad Shahram Jeff, Monica Nourman Javidzad As Co-Trustee Of The Jm Javidzad 2008 Trust Dated September 18 2008, Shahram Jeff Javidzad As Co-Trustee Of The Jm September 18 2008 Trust Dated September 18 2008, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Vivoli Michael, against Fay Servicing An Entity Of Unknown Form And Citizenship, Prestige Default Services Llc, Sprout Lending Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, Sprout Lending Llc. A Delaware Limited Liability Company, Sprout Mortgage Corporation., (total of 5) See All represented by Pelletier Kristina, Witcher Rachel Christine, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Craig D. Karlan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig D. Karlan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2020 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion - Other to Consolidate Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Non-Monetary Status; Filed by: Prestige Default Services, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Prestige Default Services, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 10, 2020Complaint - COMPLAINT (VERFIED) TO QUIET TITLE AND FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF
Date: August 10, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 10, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 10, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 12, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS
Date: August 24, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 25, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 09, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 09, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 19, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: October 19, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 10, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 19, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: December 11, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER
Date: December 11, 2020Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER
Date: January 20, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 22, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 22, 2021Motion to Consolidate
Date: February 08, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL W. VIVOLI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES
Date: February 08, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: February 08, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 08, 2021Exhibit List
Date: February 08, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 11, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO CONSOLIDATE CASE)
Date: August 03, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: August 09, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 10, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: September 30, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: September 29, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 30, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 30, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 15, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 18, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF KRISTINA M. PELLETIER RE MEET AND CONFER EFFORTS
Date: December 17, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 04, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 18, 2022Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: January 18, 2022Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER
Date: January 18, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DEFENDANTS’ NOTICE OF DEMURRER...)
Date: February 09, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: February 17, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 10, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 07, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: March 10, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 10, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 27, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: April 28, 2022Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: June 20, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 20, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: June 20, 2022Separate Statement
Date: June 20, 2022Exhibit List
Date: June 20, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 29, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 08, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 01, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 02, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: August 03, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: August 10, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 24, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Date: August 31, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 18, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING SETTLE...)
Date: November 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATION TO FILE CROSS-MOTI...)
Date: February 16, 2023Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Complaint ((Verfied) to Quiet Title and for Damages and Injunctive Relief)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Objection (to Defendant Prestige Default Services, LLC's Declaration of Non-Monetary Status)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Non-Monetary Status)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Defendants' Demurrer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party Regarding meet and Confer)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice (Defendants' Notice of Hearing on Demurrer)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO PLAINTI...))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Motion to Consolidate Case) of 03/02/2021)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Michael W. Vivoli in Support of Motion to Consolidate Cases)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Motion to Consolidate Case))
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Motion to Consolidate))
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other to Consolidate Case))
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion - Other to Consolidate Case) of 08/03/2021)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - to Plaintiff...))
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANTS? REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Reconsideration of Denial...))
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANTS? RESPONSE OPPOSING PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF DEMURRER...))
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Hearing on Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Kristina M. Pelletier re Meet and Confer Efforts)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Declaration of Demurring Party Regarding Meet and Confer
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.