Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Andreoni Sarah, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Friedman Todd, against Cars Recovery Inc., represented by Gravdal Brian T., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Craig D. Karlan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig D. Karlan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 07, 2020 |
CategoryOther Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Sarah Andreoni (Plaintiff); As to: Cars Recovery, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Case Management Conference]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Cars Recovery, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Sarah Andreoni (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sarah Andreoni (Plaintiff); As to: Cars Recovery, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 08, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Sarah Andreoni (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Cars Recovery, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Sarah Andreoni (Plaintiff)
Date: April 06, 2021Complaint
Date: August 07, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 07, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 07, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 07, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 10, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 03, 2020Answer
Date: November 03, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: February 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 08, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: February 11, 2021Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference])
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.