Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mcgaffey David C., against Meskin Farid, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Craig D. Karlan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig D. Karlan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 07, 2020 |
CategoryCollections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased On Or After January 1,2014) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Farid Meskin (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Hearing; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Farid Meskin (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Farid Meskin (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Farid Meskin (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Farid Meskin (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Hearing; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Farid Meskin (Defendant)
Date: December 28, 2021Answer; Filed by: Farid Meskin (Defendant); As to: Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Declaration of Venue; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Farid Meskin (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing) Filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted Filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: January 26, 2022Answer Filed by Farid Meskin (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: December 28, 2021Proof of Personal Service Filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Venue) Filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Venue)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Complaint (for Account Stated; Open Book Account)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.