Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Moore Ii Paul F., filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case against Gura Victor, Koiman Daniela, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Craig D. Karlan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig D. Karlan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2020 |
CategoryOther Contract Dispute (Not Breach/Insurance/Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Notice of Ruling; Filed by: PAUL F. MOORE II (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Default entered as to VICTOR GURA; DANIELA KOIMAN; On the Complaint filed by PAUL F. MOORE II on
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: PAUL F. MOORE II (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Order Notice of Assignment of Cases for All Purposes; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: PAUL F. MOORE II (Plaintiff)
Date: October 29, 2021Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Status Conference Re: 585 Package...))
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: 585 Package and Entry of Judgment; Case...))
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Order (Notice of Assignment of Cases for All Purposes)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.