Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Alex Meseonznik An Individual, Ssre Holdings Llc A California Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Wade Stephen R., against Alex Meseonznik An Individual, Derek Zirkle An Individual, Zirkle Group Llc A Califomia Limited Liability Company, represented by Horwitz Martin L, Horwitz Martin Leon, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pomona South with Peter A. Hernandez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter A. Hernandez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 17, 2020 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HousePomona South |
Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alex Meseonznik, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Trial Setting Conference;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by SSRE HOLDINGS, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by SSRE HOLDINGS, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDE...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Complaint Filed by SSRE HOLDINGS, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by ZIRKLE GROUP, LLC, a Califomia limited liability company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Order (PROPOSED ORDER) Filed by ZIRKLE GROUP, LLC, a Califomia limited liability company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Alex Meseonznik, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service Filed by Alex Meseonznik, an individual (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Trial Setting Conference;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Alex Meseonznik, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDE...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Cross-Complaint Should Not Be...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Alex Meseonznik, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Alex Meseonznik, an individual (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy; Hearing on Demurrer - witho...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER A...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Trial Setting Conference) Filed by Alex Meseonznik, an individual (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by ZIRKLE GROUP, LLC, a Califomia limited liability company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Trial Setting...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Specially Settin...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF STANLEY WETCH IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR TERMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF THOM RINDT IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR TERMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Declaration of Tom Rindt)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Declaration of Stanley Wetch)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD...))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition by Zirkle Group to Second Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDE...))
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Declaration of Stanley Wetch)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDE...))
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (Derek Zirkle Declaration)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Declaration (Martin Horwitz Declaration)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00in Department J
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Order (PROPOSED ORDER)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of 12/07/2020)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/07/2020)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER A...))
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Trial Setting Conference;) of 01/08/2021)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Specially Settin...))
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference;))
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice (OF FILING BANKRUPTCY BY PLAINTIFF SSRE HOLDINGS, LLC)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Order re. Related cases)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Demurrer to Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case and Dimissing Case)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy; Hearing on Demurrer - witho...))
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference;))
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference;))
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Trial Setting...))
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Cross-Complaint Should Not Be...))
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference;))
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Department J at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.