Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lazar Perry, Plone Trust, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Schapiro Mark Edward, against First American Title A California Corporation, First American Title Company A California Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company, Pascual Michelle, represented by Akinmurele Motunrayo, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pomona South with Thomas C. Falls presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas C. Falls Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2020 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
Filing Court HousePomona South |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Objection Proposed Order; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Errata; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Objection to REPLY; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice Continuance; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Response Demurrer and Motion to Strike; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff); PLONE TRUST (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: First American Title Company, a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Objection related case; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: January 19, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 20, 2021Response - RESPONSE DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: January 20, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 20, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: January 20, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: January 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)
Date: February 03, 2021Separate Statement
Date: February 16, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: February 16, 2021Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: February 22, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)
Date: February 24, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION DEMURRER
Date: March 09, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: March 09, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: March 24, 2021Order - ORDER TENTATIVE RULING
Date: March 24, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: March 25, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: April 12, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: April 12, 2021Separate Statement
Date: April 27, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: April 27, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: May 10, 2021Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING ERRATA
Date: May 10, 2021Separate Statement
Date: May 10, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: May 14, 2021Separate Statement
Date: May 17, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: May 17, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 07, 2021Objection - OBJECTION TO REPLY
Date: June 14, 2021Order - ORDER TENTATIVE RULING
Date: June 18, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: June 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: June 18, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: June 18, 2021Separate Statement
Date: June 25, 2021Reply - REPLY OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: June 30, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 30, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION DEMURRER
Date: June 30, 2021Separate Statement
Date: June 30, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: June 30, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR
Date: June 30, 2021Separate Statement
Date: July 06, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 08, 2021Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING ERRATA
Date: July 12, 2021Order - ORDER TENTATIVE RULING
Date: July 15, 2021Motion re: - MOTION RE: OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY REFEREE
Date: July 15, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: July 15, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: July 15, 2021Objection - OBJECTION NOTICE OF RULING
Date: July 16, 2021Notice - NOTICE AGREEMENT TO SELECTION OF DISCOVERY REFEREE NAME
Date: July 16, 2021Notice - NOTICE SELECTION OF REFEREE
Date: July 23, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: September 22, 2021Separate Statement
Date: September 22, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: September 27, 2021Reply - REPLY REPLY OF DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: October 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: October 08, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: October 08, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 10/21/2021
Date: October 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: October 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: October 28, 2021Order - ORDER FINAL RULING
Date: October 28, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: October 29, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: November 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OBJECTING TO THE APPOINTMENT OF A D...)
Date: November 16, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: November 17, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: February 14, 2022Objection - OBJECTION RELATED CASE
Date: February 15, 2022Notice (Continuance) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Opposition Demurrer; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff); PLONE TRUST (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Objection Defends Obj to P's Obj to Referee; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Taking Motion off calendar; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Order Final Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff); PLONE TRUST (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Objection NOTICE OF RULING; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Opposition Motion to Strike; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Lodging errata; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Opposition Demurrer; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: First American Title Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: First American Title Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Reply Opposition to Motion to Compel; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Lodging ERRATA; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff); PLONE TRUST (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: First American Title Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff); PLONE TRUST (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Errata) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion off calendar) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Opposition (Motion to Strike) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Opposition (Demurrer) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd)) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff); PLONE TRUST (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Reply (Opposition to Motion to Compel) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Response (Demurrer and Motion to Strike) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff); PLONE TRUST (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (2nd)) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff); PLONE TRUST (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Objection (to REPLY) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Opposition (Demurrer) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff); PLONE TRUST (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff); PLONE TRUST (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff); PLONE TRUST (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (errata) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (ERRATA) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (3rd)) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff); PLONE TRUST (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike FIRST AMERICAN...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Objection (Proposed Order) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses THER ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Notice (SELECTION OF REFEREE) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Motion re: (Objection to Discovery Referee) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Objection (related case) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Order (Final Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Notice (AGREEMENT TO SELECTION OF DISCOVERY REFEREE NAME) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by First American Title Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by First American Title Company, a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Objection (Defends Obj to P's Obj to Referee) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Objection (NOTICE OF RULING) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Objecting to the appointment of a d...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by First American Title Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by First American Title Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other re: Appointment of a Discovery Referee)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (3rd)) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff); PLONE TRUST (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice (Continuance)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Response (Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Opposition (Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Opposition (Demurrer)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDS OBJ TO P'S OBJ TO REFEREE
Date: July 30, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (3RD)
Date: July 30, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: August 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER RE: APPOINTMENT OF A DISCOVERY REFEREE)
Date: August 05, 2021Objection - OBJECTION PROPOSED ORDER
Date: August 09, 2021Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER APPOINTING DISCOVERY REFEREE
Date: August 10, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 12, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: August 23, 2021Brief - BRIEF CONSENT AND CERTIFICATION [CRC 3.904(A)(1)]
Date: August 26, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 30, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: August 31, 2021Summons (on Complaint (2nd))
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (errata)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Errata)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Objection (to REPLY)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Reply (Opposition to Motion to Compel)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion off calendar)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Opposition (Demurrer)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Doe 1 Michelle Pascual)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (ERRATA)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (3rd))
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Brief (Consent and Certification [CRC 3.904(a)(1)])
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Objection (NOTICE OF RULING)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Notice (SELECTION OF REFEREE)
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike FIRST AMERICAN...))
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice (AGREEMENT TO SELECTION OF DISCOVERY REFEREE NAME)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Objection (Defends Obj to P's Obj to Referee)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Objection (Proposed Order)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Motion re: (Objection to Discovery Referee)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order Appointing Discovery Referee)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (3rd))
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other re: Appointment of a Discovery Referee))
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses THER ...))
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Order (Final Ruling)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 10/21/2021)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Reply (Reply of Defendants to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/28/2021)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff); PLONE TRUST (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff); PLONE TRUST (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by First American Title Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Perry Lazar (Plaintiff); PLONE TRUST (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department R, Thomas C. Falls, Presiding Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Thomas C. Falls |
|
July 05, 2022 | Hearing |
Department J at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766 Jury Trial Judge: Geanene M. Yriarte |
|
July 05, 2022 | Hearing |
Department R at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766 Jury Trial Judge: Geanene M. Yriarte |
|
July 05, 2022 | Hearing | ||
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department R, Thomas C. Falls, Presiding Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Thomas C. Falls |
|
June 27, 2022 | Hearing |
Department J at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766 Final Status Conference Judge: Geanene M. Yriarte |
|
June 27, 2022 | Hearing |
Department R at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766 Final Status Conference Judge: Geanene M. Yriarte |
|
June 27, 2022 | Hearing | Final Status Conference | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department R, Thomas C. Falls, Presiding Trial Readiness Conference (reMSC/Mediation) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Trial Readiness Conference (reMSC/Mediation) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Thomas C. Falls |
|
March 02, 2022 | Hearing |
Department R at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766 Trial Readiness Conference Judge: Thomas C. Falls |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.