Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Echo Bridge Acquisitions Corp. Llc, New Century Media Corporation, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Scandura Steven, against Echo Bridge Acquisitions Corp. Llc, Paul Steven, represented by Hewitt Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pomona South with Salvatore T. Sirna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSalvatore T. Sirna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2020 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HousePomona South |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Echo Bridge Acquisitions Corp., LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: New Century Media Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: New Century Media Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Echo Bridge Acquisitions Corp., LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Lien; Filed by: Fedex Corporate Services, Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: New Century Media Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Echo Bridge Acquisitions Corp., LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Steven Paul (Defendant); As to: New Century Media Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: New Century Media Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference;))
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Receipt of Stipulation;))
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Kevin J. Leichter, Esq. Seeking Mandatory Relief In Response To OSC)
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions and Why This Matter Should ...))
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference;))
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to set aside default on cross-complaint)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Receipt of Stipulation;))
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2024 | Hearing |
Department G at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766 Post-Mediation Status Conference |
|
August 16, 2023 | Hearing | Post-Mediation Status Conference /Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Pomona Courthouse South at Department G Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
August 16, 2023 | Hearing | Post-Mediation Status Conference /Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Pomona Courthouse South at Department G | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department G, Salvatore Sirna, Presiding Post-Mediation Status Conference (/Trial Setting Conference) - Held - Continued Post-Mediation Status Conference (/Trial Setting Conference) - Held - Continued Judge: Salvatore Sirna |
|
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Post-Mediation Status Conference /Trial Setting Conference;) | |
August 16, 2023 | Hearing |
Department G at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766 Post-Mediation Status Conference |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department G Jury Trial ((time estimate5-7 days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Jury Trial ((time estimate5-7 days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department G Hearing on Motion to Compel (Production of Documents and for Terminating Sanctions) Hearing on Motion to Compel (Production of Documents and for Terminating Sanctions) |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department G Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion |
|
April 11, 2023 | Hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Pomona Courthouse South at Department G updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.