Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Swift Financial Llc As Servicing Agent For Webbank, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Schelcter Daren M., against Excel Salon & Spa Inc. A California Corporation D B A Beauty Store, Wong An Individual Scott, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pomona South with Geanene M. Yriarte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeanene M. Yriarte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 02, 2020 |
CategoryPetition To Compel/Confirm/Vacate Arbitration (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
Filing Court HousePomona South |
Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Hearing on Petition]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Swift Financial, LLC as Servicing Agent for WebBank (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to confirm arbitration award))
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to confirm arbitration award))
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Hearing on Petition])
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Judgment ([Proposed] Judgment on Petition to confirm Arbitration Award)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.