Case Last Refreshed: 17 hours ago
Dianda, Damian, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts Calaveras Superior Court with Timothy S. Healy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy S. Healy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 20, 2020 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseCalaveras Superior Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Healy, Timothy S. |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Order settling and final account | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition - After Letters Issued | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Inventory & Appraisal | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.