Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Menchini, Teri A, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts with David M. Sanders presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid M. Sanders Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 23, 2020 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for probate full/ltd authority (bond?) | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Sanders, David M. |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Other | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Sanders, David M. |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Amended Petition Filed | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Amended - No Fee | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Other | |
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of petition to administer estate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.