Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Catanzarite, James Joseph, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts with Timothy S. Healy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy S. Healy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2020 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Notice of Hearing
Date: August 24, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Healy, Timothy S. |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Order settling and final account | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition - After Letters Issued | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter Sent to | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Inventory & Appraisal | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Letters Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.