Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Goodwin, Denise, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryConservatorship - Person And Estate |
Last RefreshedMay 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
1st Accounting & Report of Conservator
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
November 15, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: First and Final Accounting and Report No appearances required. Petition is recommended for approval in all parts, except the request to discharge bond and with a deduction in At...
Judge: Judge Jed Beebe |
|
September 27, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: First and Final Accounting and Report Appearances required. Accounting is now due, but not on file. Notice to account was served May 20, 2021.
Judge: Judge Jed Beebe |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review: Investigator's Report 6 Month Status Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: Status of Accting Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review: Investigator's Report
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
August 30, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: First and Final Accounting and Report Appearances required. Accounting is now due, but not on file. Notice to account was served May 20, 2021.
Judge: Judge Jed Beebe |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: Status of Accting Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal, Filed Corrected |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.