Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Machuca, Rosemarie, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedNovember 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Final Distribution Probate Notes: The following must be submitted: Proposed Order. A proposed order must be submitted with relief that matches that requested in the petition. (L...
Judge: Judge Jed Beebe |
|
November 08, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Final Distribution Probate Notes: Probate notes will be updated on a rolling basis, generally five days before the hearing. If no probate notes are posted two days prior to the ...
Judge: Judge Jed Beebe |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Inventory & Appraisal, Filed | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice, Filed of Open Probate |
|
February 01, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition for Probate and Letters Testamentary (Updated 1/29/2021) No appearances required. Petition is recommended for approval.
Judge: Judge Jed Beebe |
|
February 01, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition for Probate and Letters Testamentary The following must be submitted: 1) Original Will. A will and any codicil to that will must be lodged with the Court. (Prob. Code, ...
Judge: Judge Jed Beebe |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Probate, Filed | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition: Probate Will & Letters Testamentary
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Last Will & Testament, Filed Signed by Jack J. Hernandez on 9/1/2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.