Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hawkins, Janet, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2021 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order, Filed to Modify Bypass Trust; Terminate Bypass Trust/Combine Subtrusts (emailed to julianna@sbelderlaw Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
January 28, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition to Modify Bypass Trust - Terminate or Combine Subtrusts Absent objection, the matter will be approved.
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
January 28, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition to Modify Bypass Trust - Terminate or Combine Subtrusts
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition :Modify Bypass Trust; Terminate Bypass Trust/Combine Subtrusts Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Petition Modify Bypass Trust; Terminate Bypass Trust/Combine Sub Trusts Granted |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Notice of Hearing, Filed -HRG: 1/28/21 |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Notice of Hearing, Filed | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.