Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Frazier, Bonnie J, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case against Frazier, David L, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMosbarger, Tamara L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2020 |
CategoryTransmutation - Pr3100 |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Petition Hearing
Date: January 19, 2021Petn or Opp - Commence a Proceeding under the Probate Code
Date: December 22, 2020Consent
Date: December 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2021 |
Proof of Mailing of Order Authorizing Transfer of Community Resources for Support of Community Spouse and Increasing Community Spouse Resource Allowance Proof of Mailing |
||
January 19, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
The Petition is granted. The Court will sign the form of order submitted by counsel.
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing of Order Authorizing Transfer of Community Resources for Support Petition Hearing Petition for Order Authorizing Transfer of Community Residence and Resources and Increasing Community Spouse Source Allowance Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
January 19, 2021 |
Order Authorizing Transfer of Community Resources for Support of Community Spouse and Increasing Community Spouse Resource Allowance Order Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
January 19, 2021 |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
||
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Probate The Petition is granted. The Court will sign the form of order submitted by counsel. |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing of Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Proof of Mailing |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem for Incompetent Person Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation Returned | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition for Order Authorizing Transfer of Community Residence and Resources and Increasing Community Spouse Source Allowance Petn or Opp - Commence a Proceeding under the Probate Code |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.