Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lopez, Mary Raye, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMosbarger, Tamara L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2020 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Letters Issued
Date: January 12, 2021Petn - Special Letters - Without Powers of Gen Personal Rep
Date: December 18, 2020Petition Hearing
Date: January 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2024 |
Notice of Continued Hearing Review Hearing Final Distribution; continued Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
May 18, 2023 |
Notice of Continued Hearing Notice |
||
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Order to Show Cause - Predisposition OSC as to Stephen Grant Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Review Hearing Final Distribution; Continued Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
May 16, 2023 |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
||
May 16, 2023 |
Tentative Ruling - Probate The Court will hear from counsel regarding the status of final distribution and as to why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to appear in court on January 10, 2023 and failure to file the petition for final distribution. |
||
May 11, 2023 |
Report on Status of Administration Status Report |
||
February 28, 2023 | Proof of Mailing | ||
January 11, 2023 |
Order to Show Cause Issued to Stephen Eric Grant Order to Show Cause - Court Issued Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Review Hearing Final Distribution; continued from 1/11/2022 Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.