Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Manley, Loring, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2019 |
CategoryConservatorship - Person And Estate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Petition For Final Discharge And Order, Filed | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt, Filed for Distribution of Loring Manley |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order, Filed Settling the Third and Final Account and Report of Conservator Upon Death of Conservatee for Payment of Attorney's Fees and for Distribution of Assets to Probate Estate |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Supervision Termination - Approval of Final Accounting | |
May 17, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Final Accounting on Death of Conservatee Appearances required.
Judge: Judge Jed Beebe |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Accounting Final Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Accounting
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Accounting, Filed Third and Final and Report of Conservator Upon Death of Conservatee and for Settlement Thereof, Petition for Payment of Attorney's Fees, and for Distribution of Assets |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Accounting - Subsequent Petition Third and Final Account and Report of Conservator Upon Death of Conservatee and for Settlement, Petition for Payment of Attorney's Fees etc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.