Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Valentine, Tara Ann, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Keithley, Clare presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeithley, Clare Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2020 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Minor - Person Only |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2021 | Proof of Mailing of Order Denying Petition for Appointment of Guardian | ||
May 10, 2021 |
Order Denying Petition for Appointment of Guardian
Judge: Keithley, Clare |
||
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing - Predispo Competing Petition in 20PR00386 Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing Visitation Order |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Visitation Order Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Appointment for Guardianship
Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Communications | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Schedule |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.