Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Harwood, Dannielle, Hieb, Lauryn, Hieb, Michael, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMosbarger, Tamara L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 03, 2020 |
CategoryConservatorship Of The Person Only |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review of Person Only Biennial Review Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing Regarding Cost Assessment PR 1851.5
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
April 14, 2022 | Proof of Mailing | ||
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 15, 2022 |
Order Continuing Conservatorship
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review of Person Only 1st Annual Review - Limited Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration and Order re Conservatorship Investigation | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Probate Based upon the Court Investigator's report filed March 7, 2022 the conservatorship remains necessary and appropriate and shall continue. Fees are deferred. The court investigator's information sheet is due by January 30, 2024 with a review hearing on March 12, 2024 at 10:15 a.m. Counsel is to submit a form of order within two weeks. |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Regarding Cost Assessment PR 1851.5
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Re. Cost Assessment and Right to Object |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.