Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Butte County Public Administrator, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMosbarger, Tamara L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2020 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Letters Issued
Date: December 08, 2020Notice of Petition to Administer Estate
Date: October 21, 2020Petition to Administer Estate
Date: October 21, 2020Petition Hearing
Date: December 08, 2020Request for Special Notice
Date: August 30, 2021Review Hearing
Date: December 07, 2021Request for Special Notice
Date: September 01, 2021Request for Special Notice
Date: July 08, 2021Affidavit
Date: November 18, 2020Receipt
Date: October 29, 2020Affidavit
Date: November 24, 2020Minute Order
Date: December 08, 2020Status Report
Date: November 04, 2021Receipt
Date: November 06, 2020Order
Date: December 07, 2021Order Appointing Administrator
Date: December 08, 2020Notice
Date: December 10, 2020Inventory and Appraisal
Date: February 09, 2021Notice of Hearing - Probate
Date: November 04, 2021Notice of Hearing - Probate
Date: May 11, 2022Review Hearing
Date: June 07, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: December 08, 2020Status Report
Date: May 11, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: December 07, 2021Minute Order
Date: December 07, 2021Notice
Date: December 10, 2020Notice of Hearing - Probate
Date: June 29, 2022Notice
Date: June 09, 2022Petn or Opp - Commence a Proceeding under the Probate Code
Date: June 09, 2022Statement
Date: June 29, 2022Petition Hearing
Date: July 05, 2022Minute Order
Date: June 07, 2022Minute Order
Date: July 05, 2022Minute Order
Date: August 02, 2022Petition Hearing
Date: August 02, 2022Minute Order
Date: September 20, 2022Petition Hearing
Date: September 20, 2022Stipulation and Order
Date: September 27, 2022Minute Order
Date: October 18, 2022Petition Hearing
Date: October 18, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: October 11, 2022Declaration
Date: September 26, 2022Final Accounting, Report, Fees and Final Distribution
Date: October 27, 2022Order
Date: December 06, 2022Review Hearing
Date: December 06, 2022Notice of Hearing - Probate
Date: October 27, 2022Minute Order
Date: December 06, 2022Receipt
Date: December 16, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: June 02, 2023Receipt on Distribution
Date: December 29, 2022Receipt
Date: January 26, 2023Review Hearing
Date: June 06, 2023Receipt on Distribution
Date: January 19, 2023Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order
Date: June 02, 2023Receipt
Date: May 11, 2023Receipt
Date: December 16, 2022Receipt
Date: December 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt on Distribution Review Hearing Final Discharge Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
June 02, 2023 | Proof of Mailing | ||
June 02, 2023 | Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order | ||
May 11, 2023 |
Receipt as to Balance Trustee Account Receipt |
||
January 26, 2023 | Receipt | ||
January 19, 2023 | Receipt on Distribution | ||
December 29, 2022 | Receipt on Distribution | ||
December 16, 2022 |
Receipt as to Bond Fee Receipt |
||
December 16, 2022 |
Receipt as to County Counsel Fees Receipt |
||
December 16, 2022 |
Receipt as to Public Administrator Fees Receipt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.