Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Schreiber, Mark, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case against Capitani, Elizabeth A, Capitani, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMosbarger, Tamara L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2020 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order for Transfer
Date: June 30, 2020Minute Order
Date: June 30, 2020Review Hearing
Date: December 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2021 |
Proof of Mailing Petition Hearing Petition to Compel Account and Report by Trustees and Partition of Real Property; Continued from 3/23/21 and 6/29/21 Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
September 28, 2021 |
Proof of Mailing Petition Hearing Petition to Approve the First Account and Report of Co-Trustee, Continued from 3/23/21 and 6/29/21 Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
September 09, 2021 | Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered | ||
September 03, 2021 |
Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Objection to Accounting Petition and Petition to Compel Account and Report by Trustees Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part |
||
July 19, 2021 | Proof of Mailing | ||
June 29, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties, this matter is continued to September 28, 2021 at 9:00 a.m.
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Accounting Hearing Petition to Approve the First Account and Report of Co-Trustee, Continued from 3/23/21 Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Petition Hearing Petition to Compel Account and Report by Trustees; and Partition of Real Property, Continued from 3/23/21 Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
June 29, 2021 |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
||
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Probate Pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties, this matter is continued to September 28, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.