Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bowlby, Valerie, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with David W. Moranda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Moranda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management198 days |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2020 |
CategoryTrust |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
|
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
|
Petition
Date: November 12, 2020Order Show Cause: Sanctions
Date: January 22, 2021Petition
Date: January 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Conference
Judge: Moranda, David |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Trial Setting Conference Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Case Management Conference Judge: Proietti, Donald |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Report | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Case Management Conference Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Substitution of Attorney |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Order Show Cause: Sanctions Judge: Proietti, Donald |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition
Judge: Proietti, Donald |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Review Hearing
Judge: Proietti, Donald |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.