Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
1827 W 208Th St Gp, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Real Emil Vincent, against Sports Studio Ventures Llc, Kim Chong Suk, represented by Kim Daniel Y, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Michael P. Vicencia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael P. Vicencia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 12, 2020 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Commercial (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Answer (Unlawful Detainer-of Daniel Y Kim)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Supplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 01/12/2021)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS))
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/08/2020)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (as to Sports Studio Ventures LLC/All Other Occupants)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473) Purs...))
Date: January 28, 2021Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((SPORTS STUDIO VENTURES LLC))
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding
Date: January 28, 2021Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Defendant Chong Suk Kim to...))
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT MOTION'S TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((CHONG SUK KIM))
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.