Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Spurlock Edward, Spurlock Industries Inc. A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Evans William D., against Foreclosure Services Inc. A California Corporation, Mccann As Trustee Of The Casey Michael Mccann Living Trust Casey Michael, Mccann Individually Casey Michael, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Long Beach with Michael P. Vicencia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael P. Vicencia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 07, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseLong Beach |
Complaint
Date: October 07, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 07, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 07, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Spurlock Industries, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Spurlock Industries, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Or...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Spurlock Industries, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: April 21, 2021Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Or...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Or...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Or...))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Or...))
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation to Stay Non-Judicial Foreclosure Proceedings and Order)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Stay Non-Judicial Foreclosure Proceedings and Order)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Or...))
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/19/2020)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.