Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nguyen Anthony, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Rayas Jonathan, against Health Net Llc; A Delaware Limited Liability Company, represented by Brick Ashley, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Long Beach with Mark C. Kim presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark C. Kim Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseLong Beach |
Complaint
Date: September 25, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Anthony Nguyen (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Anthony Nguyen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Answer Filed by Health Net, LLC; A Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Anthony Nguyen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Anthony Nguyen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/05/2020)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.