Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Price Justin, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Bhowmik Aparajit, Blumenthal Norman, Castro Deisy, Herman Jeffrey Scott, Levu Christine T., (total of 9) See All against Mistras Group Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Long Beach with Daniel J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseLong Beach |
Complaint
Date: September 18, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Justin Price (Plaintiff); As to: Mistras Group, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Justin Price (Plaintiff); As to: Mistras Group, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Justin Price (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 03, 2021Message Board Posting Re; Continuance of Hearing set for 3-30-21; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Message Board Posting Re: Request to Continue Non-Appearance set for hearing on ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement; Filed by: Justin Price (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement; Filed by: Justin Price (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Amended Complaint; Filed by: Justin Price (Plaintiff); As to: Mistras Group, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Status Conference))
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Related Case))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Vacating Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Reserving Hearing on Motion fo...))
Date: August 02, 2021Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Re: Request to Continue Non-Appearance set for hearing on 5/24/21)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: August 03, 2021Message Board Posting (Re; Continuance of Hearing set for 3-30-21)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.