Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Tan Sopheary, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Olson Shawn, against Alan Questar As The Trustee Of The Alan Questar Living Trust Dated July 7 2014, All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right Title Estate Lien Or Interest In The Property Described In The Complaint Adverse To Plaintiff'S Title Or Any Cloud Upon Plaintiff'S Title Thereto, Questar Alan, represented by Chandler Robert C., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Long Beach with Mark C. Kim presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark C. Kim Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseLong Beach |
Declaration of Shawn Olson re: OSC for Failure to File POS; Filed by: Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Updated -- Order for Publication: Filed By: Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Alan Questar (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Alan Questar (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Second Motion to Set Aside Defaul; Filed by: Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Updated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Alan Questar (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Memorandum (of Points and Authorities in Support of Default Judgment) Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Shawn Olson re: OSC for Failure to File POS) Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment Filed by Alan Questar (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Application for Publication Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Default Judgment Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Release of Pendency Action) Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: September 20, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed by Alan Questar (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: April 07, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Second Motion to Set Aside Defaul) Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: September 20, 2022Order for Publication Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Status Conference re default)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Sopheary Tan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Shawn M. Olson in Support of Application for Publication)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Shawn Olson re: OSC for Failure to File POS)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Order for Publication
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continued Case Management Conference and Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing))
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Memorandum (of Points and Authorities in Support of Default Judgment)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...))
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal))
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Sopheary Tan in Support of Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Default)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Status Conference re default))
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing))
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Second Motion to Set Aside Defaul)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5)))
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.