Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
On Deck Capital Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Katz Stuart A, against Rodriguez Roberto Aka Robert Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Long Beach with Mark C. Kim presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark C. Kim Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2020 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseLong Beach |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERTO RODRIGUEZ (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Declaration DEC OSC RE POS NON SRV; Filed by: ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Declaration DEC SAK IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DFLT JMT; Filed by: ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Summary of the Case; Filed by: ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Affidavit Proof Of Publication Of Summons; Filed by: ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Default entered as to ROBERTO RODRIGUEZ; On the Complaint filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. on
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 12, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 12, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 12, 2020Complaint
Date: August 12, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 13, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: August 13, 2020Proof of Service - No Service
Date: September 14, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DEC OSC RE POS NON SRV
Date: October 22, 2020Proof of Service - No Service
Date: October 22, 2020Proof of Service - No Service
Date: November 30, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 18, 2020Proof of Service - No Service
Date: February 16, 2021Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION
Date: March 04, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 04, 2021Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS
Date: April 05, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: May 25, 2021Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: July 08, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DEC SAK IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DFLT JMT
Date: July 08, 2021Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: July 08, 2021Summary of the Case
Date: July 08, 2021Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (ORANGE)
Date: August 04, 2021Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: August 04, 2021Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: August 06, 2021Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: January 14, 2022Writ - Return
Date: February 03, 2022Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Declaration (DEC OSC RE POS NON SRV)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Summary of the Case
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Proposed Judgment
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Orange))
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Order for Publication
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Declaration of Stuart A. Katz in Support of Application for Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF STUART A. KATZ RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination))
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Application (Application for Publication)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Affidavit (Proof Of Publication Of Summons)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Stuart A. Katz in Support of Application for Publication)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Writ - Return
Date: February 03, 2022Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Order for Publication Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Complaint Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Writ - Return Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Orange)) Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Summary of the Case Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Proposed Judgment Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Declaration (DEC OSC RE POS NON SRV) Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Affidavit (Proof Of Publication Of Summons) Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Application (Application for Publication) Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.