Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Golightyly Estelle, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Michael P. Vicencia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael P. Vicencia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 05, 2020 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 05, 2020Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: November 05, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 05, 2020Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)) Filed by Clerk
Date: January 29, 2021Decree Changing Name Filed by Clerk
Date: January 29, 2021Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: January 29, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by Estelle Golightyly (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Estelle Golightyly (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Decree Changing Name
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change))
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of 01/29/2021)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.