Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Key Star Capital Fund Ii L.P. A Delaware Limited Partnership, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Ismael Obregon, Oishii Creative Inc. A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Glendale with David A. Rosen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid A. Rosen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2020 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseGlendale |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 16, 2021Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: KEY STAR CAPITAL FUND, II, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by KEY STAR CAPITAL FUND, II, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: September 16, 2021Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040); ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Motion to Seal (the Record)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...))
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Application for Writ of Attachment)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Application for Writ of Attachment)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040); ...))
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 03/05/2021)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice (of Re-scheduled Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice (of Lodging Confidential Settlement Agreement)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.