Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mardiross Medick, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Malakan Inc. A California Corporation, represented by Winthrop Reid Adam, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Curtis A. Kin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCurtis A. Kin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management54 days |
Filing DateOctober 07, 2020 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Commercial (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: January 12, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 24, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: November 24, 2020Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((MALAKAN, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION))
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: November 30, 2020Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: November 18, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS))
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations - UD
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00UD Supplemental Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF JUDGMENT)
Date: January 12, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.