Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Express National Bank, American Express National Bank Aka American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael Lina, against Robinson Carol Aka Carol A Robinson An Individual, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Glendale with Curtis A. Kin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCurtis A. Kin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2020 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseGlendale |
Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: September 28, 2020Complaint
Date: September 28, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 28, 2020Proof of Service - No Service Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 14, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: April 16, 2021Proof of Service - No Service Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Serve; Case ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Application (APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Order for Publication
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...))
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.